MO HJR70 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-10 - Rules - Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-10 - Rules - Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes a constitutional amendment changing the term limits for statewide elected officials
Title
Proposes a constitutional amendment changing the term limits for statewide elected officials
Sponsors
Rep. Caleb Jones [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-10 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-04-09 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-04-09 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-03-13 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-03-13 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-03-12 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-03-12 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-25 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-02-05 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2014-01-23 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-01-22 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HJR70&year=2014&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills141/biltxt/intro/HJR0070I.htm |