MO HJR70 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-15 - Referred: Budget(H)
Pending: House Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-15 - Referred: Budget(H)
Pending: House Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes a constitutional amendment to direct increased funding from motor vehicle registration fee adjustments for inflation to a farm to market fund, a port development fund, the state road bond fund, and the highway patrol.
Title
Proposes a constitutional amendment to direct increased funding from motor vehicle registration fee adjustments for inflation to a farm to market fund, a port development fund, the state road bond fund, and the highway patrol.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | House | Referred: Budget(H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2019-12-02 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HJR70&year=2020&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/3615H.01I.pdf |