MO HJR70 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-03 - Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-03 - Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions for amending the constitution
Title
Modifies provisions for amending the constitution
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-16 - House - House: HJR 70 HJRs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 100 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-03 | House | Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2022-03-10 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2022-02-28 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 4 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-02-28 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-02-28 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2022-02-16 | House | Perfected (H) |
2022-02-16 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2022-02-16 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2022-02-10 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-02-09 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-02-09 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2022-02-01 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-02-01 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-02-01 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-01-26 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2022-01-06 | House | Referred: Elections and Elected Officials(H) |
2022-01-06 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2022-01-05 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2021-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |