MO HJR96 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-17 - Referred: General Laws(H)
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-17 - Referred: General Laws(H)
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds employees of school districts to the list of allowed employment for members of the general assembly
Title
Adds employees of school districts to the list of allowed employment for members of the general assembly
Sponsors
Rep. Jamie Gragg [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-17 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2024-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2023-12-06 | House | Prefiled (H) |