MO SB1007 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amends various requirements for public assistance programs administered by the state
Title
Amends various requirements for public assistance programs administered by the state
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-25 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-25 | Delivered to Governor | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by House Speaker | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by Senate President | |
2010-05-25 | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee | |
2010-05-14 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed | |
2010-05-14 | CCS H Third Read and Passed | |
2010-05-14 | CCR H adopted | |
2010-05-14 | CCS S Third Read and Passed | |
2010-05-14 | S offered & adopted CCR | |
2010-05-13 | H submitted CCR/CCS | |
2010-05-13 | H conferees appointed: Cooper, Sater, Brandom, McClanahan, Joines-63 | |
2010-05-13 | S conferees appointed: Dempsey, Schmitt, Crowell, Justus, Callahan | |
2010-05-13 | H refuses to recede and grants conference | |
2010-05-13 | S requests H recede or grant conference | |
2010-05-13 | S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended | |
2010-05-13 | H Third Read and Passed - EC adopted | |
2010-05-13 | HCS, as amended, H adopted | |
2010-05-13 | HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Burlison)--(5096L09.25H) | |
2010-05-13 | HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Dougherty)--(5096L09.19H) | |
2010-05-13 | HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Silvey)--(5096L09.17H) | |
2010-05-13 | HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Silvey)--(5096L09.28H) | |
2010-05-13 | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Sater)--(5096L09.27H) | |
2010-05-11 | Reported Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2010-05-11 | Voted Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2010-05-06 | Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) | |
2010-05-06 | HCS Reported Do Pass H Health Care Policy Committee | |
2010-05-05 | HCS Voted Do Pass H (hcomm) Committee | |
2010-05-05 | Hearing Conducted H Health Care Policy Committee | |
2010-04-30 | Referred H Health Care Policy Committee | |
2010-04-30 | H Second Read | |
2010-04-29 | H First Read | |
2010-04-29 | S Third Read and Passed | |
2010-04-29 | Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor | |
2010-04-29 | Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee | |
2010-04-29 | Hearing Conducted S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee | |
2010-04-20 | Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee | |
2010-04-20 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2010-04-19 | Perfected | |
2010-04-19 | SS, as amended, S adopted | |
2010-04-19 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2010-04-19 | SA 6 to SS S offered & adopted (Shoemyer)--(5096S03.01S) | |
2010-04-19 | SA 5 to SS S offered & adopted (Bray)--(5096S05.03S) | |
2010-04-19 | SA 4 to SS S offered & adopted (Crowell)--(5096S05.07S) | |
2010-04-19 | SA 3 to SS S offered & adopted (Schmitt)--(8024S10.01S) | |
2010-04-19 | SA 2 to SS S offered & defeated (Bray)--(5096S05.02S) | |
2010-04-19 | SA 1 to SS S offered & adopted (Green)--(5096S05.04S) | |
2010-04-19 | SS S offered (Dempsey)--(5096S.05F) | |
2010-04-13 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2010-04-08 | Reported from S Health, Mental Health, Seniors and Families Committee to Floor | |
2010-04-07 | Voted Do Pass S Health, Mental Health, Seniors and Families Committee | |
2010-03-30 | Hearing Conducted S Health, Mental Health, Seniors and Families Committee | |
2010-03-04 | Second Read and Referred S Health, Mental Health, Seniors and Families Committee | |
2010-02-25 | S First Read--SB 1007-Dempsey |