MO SB1008 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee (6313S.04C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee (6313S.04C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the Missouri Qualified Solid Biomass Fuel Producer Incentive Fund to provide economic subsidies to solid biomass fuel producers
Title
Creates the Missouri Qualified Solid Biomass Fuel Producer Incentive Fund to provide economic subsidies to solid biomass fuel producers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee (6313S.04C) |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee |
2016-02-01 | Senate | S First Read--SB 1008-Munzlinger |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=26335654 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/pdf-bill/intro/SB1008.pdf |