MO SB1016 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-14 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 1016-Mayer, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-14 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 1016-Mayer, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides the Department of Revenue with various mechanisms for the enforcement and collection of state taxes
Title
Provides the Department of Revenue with various mechanisms for the enforcement and collection of state taxes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-14 | S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 1016-Mayer, with SCS | |
2010-04-13 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2010-04-08 | Reported from S Ways and Means Committee to Floor w/SCS | |
2010-04-07 | SCS Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee (5270S.03C) | |
2010-03-17 | Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee | |
2010-03-04 | Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee | |
2010-03-01 | S First Read--SB 1016-Mayer |