MO SB1017 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-14 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 1017-Mayer, with SCS (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-14 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 1017-Mayer, with SCS (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Extends the sunsets on certain provider taxes
Title
Extends the sunsets on certain provider taxes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-14 | S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 1017-Mayer, with SCS (pending) | |
2010-04-06 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2010-04-06 | Bill Taken up for Perfection | |
2010-04-01 | Reported from S Health, Mental Health, Seniors and Families Committee to Floor w/SCS | |
2010-03-30 | SCS Voted Do Pass S Health, Mental Health, Seniors and Families Committee (5260.03C) | |
2010-03-30 | Hearing Conducted S Health, Mental Health, Seniors and Families Committee | |
2010-03-04 | Second Read and Referred S Health, Mental Health, Seniors and Families Committee | |
2010-03-01 | S First Read--SB 1017-Mayer |