MO SB1023 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-11 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-11 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions regarding the supervision of adult offenders on probation or parole from other states
Title
Modifies provisions regarding the supervision of adult offenders on probation or parole from other states
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-11 | Senate | Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Reported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2022-01-05 | Senate | S First Read |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Prefiled |