MO SB1026 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-11 - Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-11 - Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Denies unemployment benefits for those with outstanding overpayment penalties
Title
Denies unemployment benefits for those with outstanding overpayment penalties
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-11 | Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) | |
2010-05-11 | Reported Do Pass H Special Standing Committee on Workforce Development & Workplace Safety Committee | |
2010-05-11 | Voted Do Pass H Special Standing Committee on Workforce Development & Workplace Safety Committee | |
2010-05-11 | Hearing Conducted H Special Standing Committee on Workforce Development & Workplace Safety Committee | |
2010-05-06 | Hearing Cancelled H Special Standing Committee on Workforce Development & Workplace Safety Committee | |
2010-05-04 | Referred H Special Standing Committee on Workforce Development & Workplace Safety Committee | |
2010-04-30 | H Second Read | |
2010-04-29 | H First Read | |
2010-04-29 | S Third Read and Passed | |
2010-04-29 | Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor | |
2010-04-29 | Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee | |
2010-04-29 | Hearing Conducted S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee | |
2010-04-15 | Hearing Scheduled But Not Heard S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee | |
2010-03-31 | Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee | |
2010-03-31 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2010-03-30 | Perfected | |
2010-03-25 | Reported from S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee to Floor | |
2010-03-22 | Voted Do Pass S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee | |
2010-03-22 | Hearing Conducted S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee | |
2010-03-16 | Hearing Scheduled But Not Heard S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee | |
2010-03-04 | Second Read and Referred S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee | |
2010-03-01 | S First Read--SB 1026-Rupp |