MO SB1026 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 1026-Schatz, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 1026-Schatz, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a lifetime permit to carry concealed firearms
Title
Creates a lifetime permit to carry concealed firearms
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Schatz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 1026-Schatz, with SCS |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Reported from S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee, with SCS |
2016-03-16 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee (5559S.04C) |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2016-02-03 | Senate | S First Read--SB 1026-Schatz |