MO SB1069 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-27 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee (4948S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-27 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee (4948S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creates provisions relating to the use of refrigerants
Title
Creates provisions relating to the use of refrigerants
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-27 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee (4948S.02C) |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2022-01-18 | Senate | S First Read |