MO SB1072 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-21 - Voted Do Pass S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-21 - Voted Do Pass S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for supplemental reimbursement for emergency ground medical transportation services under MO HealthNet
Title
Provides for supplemental reimbursement for emergency ground medical transportation services under MO HealthNet
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-21 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee |
2016-02-22 | Senate | S First Read--SB 1072-Hegeman |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=28812395 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/pdf-bill/intro/SB1072.pdf |