MO SB1087 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-6)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-05 - Hearing Conducted S Seniors, Families and Children Committee
Pending: Senate Seniors, Families and Children Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-05 - Hearing Conducted S Seniors, Families and Children Committee
Pending: Senate Seniors, Families and Children Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the Office of Missing Persons Advocate
Title
Creates the Office of Missing Persons Advocate
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-05 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2016-02-24 | Senate | S First Read--SB 1087-Romine, et al |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=29034424 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/pdf-bill/intro/SB1087.pdf |