MO SB1091 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 1091-Riddle
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 1091-Riddle
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that a person who is injured by a product has 10 years after the sale or lease of the product to bring a suit for damages
Title
Provides that a person who is injured by a product has 10 years after the sale or lease of the product to bring a suit for damages
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 1091-Riddle |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Reported from S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2016-02-25 | Senate | S First Read--SB 1091-Riddle |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=29158888 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/pdf-bill/intro/SB1091.pdf |