MO SB1113 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-05 - Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-05 - Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enacts provisions relating to driver's education and training
Title
Enacts provisions relating to driver's education and training
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-05 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2022-01-31 | Senate | S First Read |