MO SB1116 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-29 - Voted Do Pass S Insurance and Banking Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-29 - Voted Do Pass S Insurance and Banking Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to travel insurance
Title
Modifies provisions relating to travel insurance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2022-01-31 | Senate | S First Read |