MO SB1130 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-28 - Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-28 - Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to earned compliance credits for probation
Title
Modifies provisions relating to earned compliance credits for probation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2022-02-07 | Senate | S First Read |