MO SB1142 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-14 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Education Committee (5577S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-14 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Education Committee (5577S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires certain public schools, charter schools, and public institutions of higher education to post suicide prevention phone and text numbers on student identification cards
Title
Requires certain public schools, charter schools, and public institutions of higher education to post suicide prevention phone and text numbers on student identification cards
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-14 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Education Committee (5577S.02C) |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee |
2022-02-11 | Senate | S First Read |