MO SB1155 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-13 - Voted Do Pass S Health and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-13 - Voted Do Pass S Health and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows 2011 Tier uniformed members of the Missouri State Highway Patrol to be eligible for BackDROP
Title
Allows 2011 Tier uniformed members of the Missouri State Highway Patrol to be eligible for BackDROP
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Health and Pensions Committee |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Health and Pensions Committee |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Health and Pensions Committee |
2022-02-23 | Senate | S First Read |