MO SB1298 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-17 - S Bills with H Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-17 - S Bills with H Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to cotton trailers
Title
Modifies provisions relating to cotton trailers
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Bean [R] | Rep. Donnie Brown [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-17 | House | S Bills with H Amendments |
2024-05-06 | House | H Third Read and Passed, as amended |
2024-05-06 | House | HA 11 H offered & adopted (Taylor-48)--(4984S02.22H) |
2024-05-06 | House | HA 10 H offered & adopted (Christofanelli)--(4984S02.26H) |
2024-05-06 | House | HA 9, as amended, H adopted --(4984S02.12H) |
2024-05-06 | House | HA 1 to HA 9 H offered & adopted (Marquart)--(4984S02.48H) |
2024-05-06 | House | HA 9 H offered (Lovasco)--(4984S02.12H) |
2024-05-06 | House | HA 8, as amended, H adopted --(4984S02.14H) |
2024-05-06 | House | HA 5 to HA 8 H offered & adopted (Dinkins)--(4984S02.53H) |
2024-05-06 | House | HA 4 to HA 8 H offered & adopted (Casteel)--(4984S02.51H) |
2024-05-06 | House | HA 3 to HA 8 H offered & adopted (Thomas)--(4984S02.38H) |
2024-05-06 | House | HA 2 to HA 8 H offered & adopted (Murphy)--(4984S02.49H) |
2024-05-06 | House | HA 1 to HA 8 H offered & adopted (Perkins)--(4984S02.40H) |
2024-05-06 | House | HA 8 H offered (Busick)--(4984S02.14H) |
2024-05-06 | House | HA 7, as amended, H adopted --(4984S02.16H) |
2024-05-06 | House | HA 5 to HA 7 H offered & adopted (Smith-155)--(4984S02.44H) |
2024-05-06 | House | HA 4 to HA 7 H offered & defeated (Keathley)--(4984S02.42H) |
2024-05-06 | House | HA 3 to HA 7 H offered & adopted (Burger)--(4984S02.34H) |
2024-05-06 | House | HA 2 to HA 7 H offered & adopted (Sharpe-4)--(4984S02.43H) |
2024-05-06 | House | HA 1 to HA 7 H offered & adopted (Francis)--(4984S02.35H) |
2024-05-06 | House | HA 7 H offered (Gregory)--(4984S02.16H) |
2024-05-06 | House | HA 6, as amended, H adopted --(4984S02.17H) |
2024-05-06 | House | HA 2 to HA 6 H offered & adopted (Weber)--(4984S02.37H) |
2024-05-06 | House | HA 1 to HA 6 H offered & adopted (Peters)--(4984S02.33H) |
2024-05-06 | House | HA 6 H offered (Diehl)--(4984S02.17H) |
2024-05-06 | House | HA 5, as amended, H adopted --(4984S02.15H) |
2024-05-06 | House | HA 1 to HA 5 H offered & adopted (Seitz)--(4984S02.32H) |
2024-05-06 | House | HA 5 H offered (Toalson Reisch)--(4984S02.15H) |
2024-05-06 | House | HA 4 H offered & adopted (Taylor-48)--(4984S02.25H) |
2024-05-06 | House | HA 3 H offered & adopted (Knight)--(4984S02.21H) |
2024-05-06 | House | HA 2 H offered & adopted (Baker)--(4984S02.20H) |
2024-05-06 | House | HA 1 H offered & adopted (Baker)--(4984S02.01H) |
2024-05-02 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2024-05-02 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2024-04-30 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review |
2024-04-22 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Regulatory Oversight |
2024-04-22 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Regulatory Oversight |
2024-04-17 | House | Referred H Rules - Regulatory Oversight |
2024-04-11 | House | Reported Do Pass H Agriculture Policy |
2024-04-11 | House | Voted Do Pass H Agriculture Policy |
2024-04-04 | House | Hearing Conducted H Agriculture Policy |
2024-03-28 | House | Referred H Agriculture Policy |
2024-03-11 | House | H Second Read |
2024-03-07 | House | H First Read |
2024-03-07 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Reported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Perfected |
2024-02-28 | Senate | SS S offered & adopted (Bean)--(4984S.02F) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Reported from S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2024-01-04 | Senate | S First Read |