MO SB1356 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-25 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee (5121S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-25 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee (5121S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to fees collected by the Missouri emergency response commission
Title
Modifies provisions relating to fees collected by the Missouri emergency response commission
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee (5121S.02C) |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2024-01-24 | Senate | S First Read |