MO SB1365 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Voted Do Pass S Economic Development and Tax Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Voted Do Pass S Economic Development and Tax Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes an income tax deduction for certain research expenses
Title
Authorizes an income tax deduction for certain research expenses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Economic Development and Tax Policy Committee |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Economic Development and Tax Policy Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Economic Development and Tax Policy Committee |
2024-01-25 | Senate | S First Read |