MO SB1379 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-17 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-17 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to funding for the Office of the Public Defender
Title
Modifies provisions relating to funding for the Office of the Public Defender
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-17 | Senate | Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Reported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Removed S Consent Calendar |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Reported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee - Consent |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee - Consent vote adopted |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | S First Read |