MO SB1401 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-27 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Veterans, Military Affairs and Pensions Committee (5573S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-27 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Veterans, Military Affairs and Pensions Committee (5573S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that the Commissioner of Administration shall request a certain amount of the Missouri State Employees' Retirement System employer contribution rate for certain state colleges and universities
Title
Provides that the Commissioner of Administration shall request a certain amount of the Missouri State Employees' Retirement System employer contribution rate for certain state colleges and universities
Sponsors
Sen. Rusty Black [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Veterans, Military Affairs and Pensions Committee (5573S.02C) |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Veterans, Military Affairs and Pensions Committee |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Veterans, Military Affairs and Pensions Committee |
2024-02-08 | Senate | S First Read |