MO SB1411 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-26 - Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-26 - Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends the expiration date of the Uniform Small Wireless Facility Deployment Act
Title
Extends the expiration date of the Uniform Small Wireless Facility Deployment Act
Sponsors
Sen. Karla May [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2024-02-13 | Senate | S First Read |