MO SB1431 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-15 - Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-15 - Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes entertainment districts for certain counties
Title
Establishes entertainment districts for certain counties
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2024-02-21 | Senate | S First Read |