MO SB356 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions pertaining to agriculture
Title
Modifies provisions pertaining to agriculture
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-11 | Signed by Governor | |
2011-05-26 | Delivered to Governor | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by House Speaker | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by Senate President | |
2011-05-26 | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee | |
2011-05-13 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed | |
2011-05-13 | CCS#2 H Third Read and Passed - EC adopted | |
2011-05-13 | CCR#2 H adopted | |
2011-05-13 | CCS#2 S Third Read and Passed - EC adopted | |
2011-05-13 | CCR#2 S offered & adopted | |
2011-05-12 | H submits CCR#2 | |
2011-05-12 | S conferees appointed: Munzlinger, Parson, Brown, Callahan, Justus | |
2011-05-12 | H conferees re-appointed: Loehner, Schad, Wright, Holsman, Harris | |
2011-05-12 | H grants further conference | |
2011-05-12 | H submits CCR | |
2011-05-12 | S requests H grant further conference | |
2011-05-12 | S conferees appointed: Munzlinger, Parson, Brown, Callahan, Justus | |
2011-05-11 | H conferees appointed: Loehner, Schad, Wright, Holsman, Harris | |
2011-05-11 | H refuses to recede and grants conference | |
2011-05-11 | S requests H recede or grant conference | |
2011-05-11 | S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended | |
2011-05-11 | H Third Read and Passed - EC adopted | |
2011-05-11 | HCS, as amended, H adopted | |
2011-05-11 | HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Klippenstein)--(178706.05H) | |
2011-05-11 | HA 3 to HCS H adopted | |
2011-05-11 | HA 1 to HA 3 to HCS H offered & defeated (Brattin)--(1787L06.21H) | |
2011-05-11 | HA 3 to HCS H offered (Schad)--(1787L06.12H) | |
2011-05-11 | HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Cauthorn)--(1787L06.02H) | |
2011-05-11 | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Loehner)--(1787L06.11H) | |
2011-05-05 | HCS Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee | |
2011-05-05 | HCS Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee | |
2011-05-04 | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee | |
2011-05-04 | HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2011-05-04 | HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2011-04-26 | Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) | |
2011-04-26 | HCS Reported Do Pass H Agriculture Policy Committee | |
2011-04-26 | HCS Voted Do Pass H Agriculture Policy Committee | |
2011-04-19 | Hearing Conducted H Agriculture Policy Committee | |
2011-04-12 | Referred H Agriculture Policy Committee | |
2011-04-11 | H Second Read | |
2011-04-07 | H First Read | |
2011-04-07 | S Third Read and Passed | |
2011-04-05 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2011-04-05 | Perfected | |
2011-04-05 | SCS S adopted | |
2011-03-17 | Reported from S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee to Floor w/SCS | |
2011-03-16 | SCS Voted Do Pass S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee - (1787S.03C) | |
2011-03-09 | Hearing Conducted S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee | |
2011-03-03 | Second Read and Referred S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee | |
2011-02-28 | S First Read--SB 356-Munzlinger |