MO SB724 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the Office of Election Crimes and Security within the Secretary of State's Office
Title
Creates the Office of Election Crimes and Security within the Secretary of State's Office
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-25 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2024-01-03 | Senate | S First Read |
2023-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |