DC B25-0769 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-09 - Law L25-0198, Effective from Jul 19, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 009911, Expires on Mar 01, 2025
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-09 - Law L25-0198, Effective from Jul 19, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 009911, Expires on Mar 01, 2025
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Certified Business Enterprise Program Compliance and Enforcement Support Temporary Amendment Act of 2024
Title
Certified Business Enterprise Program Compliance and Enforcement Support Temporary Amendment Act of 2024
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-07 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-09 | Council | Law L25-0198, Effective from Jul 19, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 009911, Expires on Mar 01, 2025 |
2024-06-07 | Council | Act A25-0484 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 006756 |
2024-06-05 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2024-05-30 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2024-05-29 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0484 |
2024-05-21 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on June 3, 2024 |
2024-05-07 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2024-04-02 | Council | First Reading |
2024-04-02 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2024-04-01 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |