MO SB724 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-16 - Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-16 - Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions of the Motor Vehicle Franchise Practices Act
Title
Modifies provisions of the Motor Vehicle Franchise Practices Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-16 | Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee | |
2010-01-19 | Second Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee | |
2010-01-06 | S First Read--SB 724-Griesheimer | |
2009-12-31 | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/10info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=3158921 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/10info/pdf-bill/intro/SB724.pdf |