MO SB724 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 724-Parson
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 724-Parson
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the law relating to the filing of fraudulent financing statements with the Secretary of State and real property documents with recorders of deeds
Title
Modifies the law relating to the filing of fraudulent financing statements with the Secretary of State and real property documents with recorders of deeds
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Parson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | Senate | S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 724-Parson |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Reported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee to Floor |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2014-01-14 | Senate | S First Read--SB 724-Parson |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/14info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=28296863 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/14info/pdf-bill/intro/SB724.pdf |