MO SB726 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-03 - Motion to vote bill do pass failed S Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-03 - Motion to vote bill do pass failed S Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts admission fees for yoga and certain other physical training programs from state and local sales and use tax
Title
Exempts admission fees for yoga and certain other physical training programs from state and local sales and use tax
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Bray [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-03 | Motion to vote bill do pass failed S Ways and Means Committee | |
2010-02-08 | Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee | |
2010-01-19 | Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee | |
2010-01-06 | S First Read--SB 726-Bray | |
2010-01-04 | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/10info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=3160156 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/10info/pdf-bill/intro/SB726.pdf |