MO SB745 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-18 - S Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 745-Lembke
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-18 - S Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 745-Lembke
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides protections for Alternatives to Abortion Agencies to freely engage in religious practices
Title
Provides protections for Alternatives to Abortion Agencies to freely engage in religious practices
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Lembke [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-18 | S Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 745-Lembke | |
2012-05-01 | Reported from S Health, Mental Health, Seniors and Families Committee to Floor | |
2012-05-01 | Voted Do Pass S Health, Mental Health, Seniors and Families Committee | |
2012-03-06 | Hearing Conducted S Health, Mental Health, Seniors and Families Committee | |
2012-02-09 | Second Read and Referred S Health, Mental Health, Seniors and Families Committee | |
2012-02-02 | S First Read--SB 745-Lembke |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/12info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=1047082 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/12info/pdf-bill/intro/SB745.pdf |