MO SB745 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-12 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Professional Registration Committee (4484S.03C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-12 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Professional Registration Committee (4484S.03C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to advanced practice registered nurses in collaborative practice agreements
Title
Modifies provisions relating to advanced practice registered nurses in collaborative practice agreements
Sponsors
Sen. David Sater [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-12 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Professional Registration Committee (4484S.03C) |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Professional Registration Committee |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Professional Registration Committee |
2018-01-03 | Senate | S First Read--SB 745-Sater |
2017-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=69471842 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/pdf-bill/intro/SB745.pdf |