MO SB746 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-23 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee (4745S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-23 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee (4745S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies laws regarding arbitration agreements between employers and at-will employees
Title
Modifies laws regarding arbitration agreements between employers and at-will employees
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Romine [R] | Sen. Mike Kehoe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-23 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee (4745S.02C) |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2016-01-06 | Senate | S First Read--SB 746-Romine and Kehoe |
2015-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=22246438 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/pdf-bill/intro/SB746.pdf |