MO SB746 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-28 - Voted Do Pass S Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-28 - Voted Do Pass S Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that a food or merchandise container shall not be deemed to be misleading, misbranded, or unfairly marketed if the container is filled to less than its capacity if certain criteria are present
Title
Provides that a food or merchandise container shall not be deemed to be misleading, misbranded, or unfairly marketed if the container is filled to less than its capacity if certain criteria are present
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-28 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Government Reform Committee |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Government Reform Committee |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Government Reform Committee |
2020-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 746-Burlison |
2019-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=26838092 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/pdf-bill/intro/SB746.pdf |