MO SB763 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-02 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee (4287S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-02 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee (4287S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to net metering
Title
Modifies provisions relating to net metering
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-02 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee (4287S.02C) |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2022-01-05 | Senate | S First Read |
2021-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |