MO SB765 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-24 - Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-24 - Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to offenses against police dogs
Title
Modifies provisions relating to offenses against police dogs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-24 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2022-01-05 | Senate | S First Read |
2021-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |