MO SB769 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-17 - Voted Do Pass S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-17 - Voted Do Pass S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits political subdivisions from enacting ordinances relating to the labeling or use of fertilizers or soil conditioners
Title
Prohibits political subdivisions from enacting ordinances relating to the labeling or use of fertilizers or soil conditioners
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-17 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2016-01-06 | Senate | S First Read--SB 769-Munzlinger |
2015-12-02 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=22261401 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/pdf-bill/intro/SB769.pdf |