MO SB769 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-08 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Education Committee (4126S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-08 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Education Committee (4126S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creates provisions establishing pilot recovery high schools for students in recovery from substance use disorder or substance dependency
Title
Creates provisions establishing pilot recovery high schools for students in recovery from substance use disorder or substance dependency
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Education Committee (4126S.02C) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee |
2022-01-05 | Senate | S First Read |
2021-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |