MO SB770 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-20 - Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-20 - Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies competitive bidding requirements applicable to counties
Title
Modifies competitive bidding requirements applicable to counties
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-20 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2018-01-03 | Senate | S First Read--SB 770-Hegeman |
2017-12-05 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=69493042 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/pdf-bill/intro/SB770.pdf |