MO SB775 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-12 - Hearing Conducted S Progress and Development Committee
Pending: Senate Progress And Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-12 - Hearing Conducted S Progress and Development Committee
Pending: Senate Progress And Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Abolishes the death penalty and provides that any person sentenced to death before August 28, 2014 must be sentenced to life imprisonment without parole
Title
Abolishes the death penalty and provides that any person sentenced to death before August 28, 2014 must be sentenced to life imprisonment without parole
Sponsors
Sen. Gina Walsh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-12 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Progress and Development Committee |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Progress and Development Committee |
2014-01-23 | Senate | S First Read--SB 775-Walsh |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/14info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=28719753 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/14info/pdf-bill/intro/SB775.pdf |