MO SB780 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-05 - Voted Do Pass S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-05 - Voted Do Pass S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the composition of the Missouri Board for Architects, Professional Engineers, Professional Land Surveyors and Landscape Architects
Title
Modifies the composition of the Missouri Board for Architects, Professional Engineers, Professional Land Surveyors and Landscape Architects
Sponsors
Sen. Jay Wasson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-05 | Voted Do Pass S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee | |
2012-02-27 | Hearing Conducted S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee | |
2012-02-16 | Second Read and Referred S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee | |
2012-02-13 | S First Read--SB 780-Wasson |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/12info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=1825630 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/12info/pdf-bill/intro/SB780.pdf |