MO SB781 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-20 - HCS Voted Do Pass H Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-20 - HCS Voted Do Pass H Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies various provisions relating to the regulation of motor vehicles
Title
Modifies various provisions relating to the regulation of motor vehicles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-20 | HCS Voted Do Pass H Transportation Committee | |
2010-04-13 | Hearing Conducted H Transportation Committee | |
2010-03-30 | Referred H Transportation Committee | |
2010-03-19 | H Second Read | |
2010-03-18 | H First Read | |
2010-03-18 | S Third Read and Passed | |
2010-03-18 | Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor | |
2010-03-18 | Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee | |
2010-03-03 | Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee | |
2010-03-03 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2010-03-03 | Perfected | |
2010-03-03 | SS for SCS, as amended, S adopted | |
2010-03-03 | SA 6 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Bartle)--(4466S05.06S) | |
2010-03-03 | SA 5 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Nodler)--(4466S05.13S) | |
2010-03-03 | SA 4 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Lembke)--(8068S10.01S) | |
2010-03-03 | SA 3 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Griesheimer)--(4466S05.11S) | |
2010-03-03 | SA 2 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Rupp)--(4466S04.06S) | |
2010-03-03 | SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Rupp)--(4466S04.10S) | |
2010-03-03 | SS for SCS S offered (McKenna)--(4466S.05F) | |
2010-02-25 | Reported from S Transportation Committee to Floor w/SCS | |
2010-02-17 | SCS Voted Do Pass S Transportation Committee - (4466S.04C) | |
2010-01-27 | Hearing Conducted S Transportation Committee | |
2010-01-19 | Second Read and Referred S Transportation Committee | |
2010-01-14 | S First Read--SB 781-McKenna |