MO SB783 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Third Reading--SB 783-Onder
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Third Reading--SB 783-Onder
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes telephone companies to elect to have their tangible personal property assessed in accordance with a depreciation schedule
Title
Authorizes telephone companies to elect to have their tangible personal property assessed in accordance with a depreciation schedule
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Third Reading--SB 783-Onder |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Motion to return bill from Governmental Accountability & Fiscal Oversight Committee due to revised fiscal note - adopted |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Hearing Scheduled But Not Heard S Governmental Accountability & Fiscal Oversight Committee (Fiscal Oversight) |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Perfected, as amended |
2016-02-16 | Senate | SA 1 S offered & adopted (Onder)--(4049S01.06S) |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Reported from S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2016-01-06 | Senate | S First Read--SB 783-Onder |
2015-12-03 | Senate | Prefiled |