MO SB789 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SBs 789 & 595-Wasson, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SBs 789 & 595-Wasson, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to construction contracts entered into by political subdivisions
Title
Modifies provisions relating to construction contracts entered into by political subdivisions
Sponsors
Sen. Jay Wasson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SBs 789 & 595-Wasson, with SCS |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Reported from S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee w/SCS |
2016-02-09 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (w/SCS SBs 789 & 595) S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee (5101S.05C) |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Re-referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee |
2016-01-06 | Senate | S First Read--SB 789-Wasson |
2015-12-08 | Senate | Prefiled |