MO SB791 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-06 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee (5201S.04C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-06 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee (5201S.04C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to corporate security advisors
Title
Modifies provisions relating to corporate security advisors
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Parson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-06 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee (5201S.04C) |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2016-01-06 | Senate | S First Read--SB 791-Parson |
2015-12-08 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=22426278 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/pdf-bill/intro/SB791.pdf |