MO SB796 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-12 - Second Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy And The Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-12 - Second Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy And The Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Missouri Department of Natural Resources to submit an initial state plan and 2-year extension to the Environmental Protection Agency by June 30, 2016
Title
Requires the Missouri Department of Natural Resources to submit an initial state plan and 2-year extension to the Environmental Protection Agency by June 30, 2016
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Romine [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-12 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2016-01-06 | Senate | S First Read--SB 796-Romine |
2015-12-09 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=22459624 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/pdf-bill/intro/SB796.pdf |