MO SB796 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - H Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading w/HCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - H Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading w/HCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the licensure of health care professionals
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the licensure of health care professionals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | House | H Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading w/HCS |
2018-05-11 | House | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-05-09 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2018-05-08 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2018-05-07 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2018-05-07 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Professional Registration and Licensing |
2018-04-25 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Professional Registration and Licensing |
2018-04-04 | House | Referred H Professional Registration and Licensing |
2018-03-08 | House | H Second Read |
2018-03-07 | House | H First Read |
2018-03-07 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Perfected, as amended |
2018-03-05 | Senate | SA 2 S offered & adopted (Sifton)--(5456S01.01F) |
2018-03-05 | Senate | SA 1 S offered & adopted (Schupp)--(5456S01.01S) |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Reported from S Professional Registration Committee |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Professional Registration Committee |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Motion to vote bill do pass CONSENT failed S Professional Registration Committee |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Professional Registration Committee |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Professional Registration Committee |
2018-01-03 | Senate | S First Read--SB 796-Koenig |
2017-12-12 | Senate | Prefiled |